Novatek board of directors
WebNOVATEK's Board of Directors Recommends 2024 Dividend 17 March 2024. NOVATEK’s Board of Directors Approve Agenda for Annual General Meeting of Shareholders 07 February 2024. Notice of Intended Delisting from the London Stock Exchange 06 February 2024. NOVATEK and Deepak Fertilisers Sign MoU on LNG and Low-Carbon Ammonia ... WebNOVATEK's Member of the Board of Directors, Chairman of Management Board, Director is Leonid Viktorovich Mikhelson. NOVATEK's key executives include Leonid Viktorovich Mikhelson and 24 others. Leonid Viktorovich Mikhelson Member of the Board of Directors, Chairman of Management Board, Director Vladimir Alekseevich Baskov
Novatek board of directors
Did you know?
WebPAO NOVATEK has announced that the Extraordinary General Meeting of Shareholders (EGM) approved the election of members to the Board of Directors. The following … WebMar 21, 2024 · Gennady Timchenko resigns from Novatek board of directors prior to AGM MOSCOW. March 21 (Interfax) - Russian entrepreneur Gennady Timchenko, owner of one of the largest stakes in Novatek , has resigned from the company's board of directors on his own accord on March 21, 2024, the independent natural gas producer said in a statement …
WebDec 31, 2024 · Novatek Board of Directors Proposes Dividend Distribution 04/26/2024 06:00am EDT Novatek Microelectronics Corp. proposed the appropriations of earnings in cash dividends to shareholders of TWD 15.60 per share. Cash distributed from legal reserve and capital surplus to shareholders was TWD 0.00 per share. WebNovatek (Russian: ПАО ... In April 2024, former Deputy Chairman on the Board of Directors, Sergey Protosenya, reportedly stunned his wife and daughter with an axe and then stabbed them to death before hanging himself, at a luxury villa in Lloret de Mar, Spain. He had a fortune of over $400 million.
WebDec 20, 2024 · Russia’s largest independent natural gas producer Novatek has passed the resolution to change the composition of its management board. Yamal LNG; Courtesy of Novatek Firstly, the company’s board of directors terminated the powers of the board member Evgeny Kot. WebJul 7, 2024 · MOSCOW (Reuters) - Russia's government has approved the sale of Shell's former 27.5% stake in the Sakhalin-2 energy project to Russian energy firm Novatek for 94.8 billion roubles ($1.16 billion), a government order showed on Wednesday. Russian President Vladimir Putin gave his consent for the transfer of the required funds to Shell, Russian ...
WebSep 6, 2013 · MOSCOW, Sept. 6, 2013 /PRNewswire/ -- OAO NOVATEK ("NOVATEK" or the "Company") today announced the results of its Board of Directors ("the Board") meeting held in Sabetta, Yamal- Nenets...
WebApr 27, 2024 · PAO NOVATEK announced today that the Annual General Meeting of Shareholders ('AGM') approved the election of members to the Board of Directors. The following members were elected to the Board of Directors: Andrei I. Akimov: Chairman of the Management Board of Gazprombank (Joint Stock Company); Arnaud Le Foll: General … heritage valley chippewa labWebMar 21, 2024 · PAO NOVATEK (the “Company”) announced that Gennady Timchenko has decided to resign from the Company’s Board of Directors effective 21 March 2024. PAO NOVATEK is the largest independent natural gas producer in Russia, and in 2024, entered the global LNG market by successfully launching the Yamal LNG project. maurice yannickWebMar 22, 2024 · PAO NOVATEK announced that Gennady Timchenko has decided to resign from the Company’s Board of Directors effective 21 March 2024. Source ROGTEC Magazine – Russian Oil and Gas Technologies Magazine is Russia's and the Caspian's leading, independent, upstream publication heritage valley chippewa pa labhttp://gasprocessingnews.com/news/2024/07/novatek-creates-subsidiary-to-develop-domestic-lng-fuel-market/ maurice yeatesWebApr 27, 2024 · The following members were elected to the Board of Directors: · Andrei I. Akimov: Chairman of the Management Board of Gazprombank (Joint Stock Company); · … maurice yearburyWebApr 27, 2024 · PAO NOVATEK announced today that the Annual General Meeting of Shareholders ('AGM') approved the election of members to the Board of Directors. The … heritage valley center twpWebBoard of Directors The board of Novotek AB consists of the following persons: Göran Andersson Bjärred, born 1944, M.Sc. Eng. Chairman. Board member since 1986 and … maurice yee